Vo, David Hoang Dung (CPSO#: 75309)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: Vo, Hoang Dung (used until: 30 May 2001 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:Universite de Hue, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 111
1315 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M3J 2G6
Phone: (416) 631-6888
Fax: (416) 631-6887
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mississauga Medical Centre
3980 Grand Park Drive, Unit A-2
Mississauga ON  L5B 4M6
Canada
Phone: (905) 615-0107
Fax: (905) 615-1711
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID HOANG DUNG VO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2002