Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Vo, Tuyet Bach (CPSO#: 52299)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Aug 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:Medical and Pharmaceutical University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2721 Jane Street
Unit 2
Downsview ON  M3L 1S3
Phone: (416) 748-0803
Fax: (416) 748-0677
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tuyet Vo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 04 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Vo ( CPSO# 52299 )

Business Address:
Unit 2
2721 Jane Street
Downsview ON  M3L 1S3
Phone Number: (416) 748-0803

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 01 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TUYET BACH VO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1989