Vobecky, Jitka Suzanne (CPSO#: 60129)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 25 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 25 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1989