Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Vockentanz, Birgit Marianne (CPSO#: 62603)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Aug 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
595 Bradley Avenue
London ON  N6E 3Z8
Phone: (519) 680-1721
Fax: (519) 680-0434
Electoral District: 02

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BIRGIT MARIANNE VOCKENTANZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOCKENTANZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1991