Vogt, Lily (CPSO#: 33178)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Names: Shaparen, Lily (used until: 18 Feb 1987 )     Shaparew, Lily (used until: 27 Sep 1984 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2006