Vohra, Angeli (CPSO#: 82556)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Upper Appleby Professional Centre
1960 Appleby Line
Suite 26
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone: (905) 335-6142
Fax: (905) 335-5929
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Angeli Vohra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Vohra ( CPSO# 82556 )

Business Address:
26 - 1960 Appleby Line
Halton Hills ON  L7L 0B7
Phone Number: (905) 335-6142

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELI VOHRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOHRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2007