Voigtlander-Bolz, Julia Ilse Melissa (CPSO#: 89926)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Ludwig Maximilian University at Munich, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2008 to 16 Dec 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 17 Dec 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Sep 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jul 2013