Voineskos, Aristotle Nicholas (CPSO#: 79541)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C A M H Clarke Site
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 34378
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARISTOTLE NICHOLAS VOINESKOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOINESKOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008