Voineskos, George (CPSO#: 41629)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Feb 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Feb 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:National and Capodistrias Univ of Athens, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Feb 2018

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: February 27, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. George Voineskos to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 27, 2018:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Voineskos failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. During the course of this investigation, Dr. Voineskos retired from practice for health reasons. As a result, Dr. Voineskos has resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)