Voitk, Andrus Juhan (CPSO#: 20708)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Estonian, French, German, Swedish

Education:University of Toronto, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 11 Mar 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Apr 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jul 2001