Vojdani, Merle Ang (CPSO#: 59070)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 23 Jun 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Philippines Inst. of Med Found, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Freeport Site
PO Box 9056 Station C
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Best Value Optical
158 University Avenue West
Waterloo ON  N2L 3E9
Canada
Phone: (519) 888-6655
Fax: (519) 888-6622
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Merle Vojdani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Vojdani ( CPSO# 59070 )
Dr. O. Vojdani ( CPSO# 88245 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Division of Oncology
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4378

Business Address:
Unit B
158 University Avenue West
Waterloo ON  N2L 3E9
Phone Number: (519) 888-6655

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Oncology Effective: 23 Jun 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Dec 1989
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 22 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 22 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Nov 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 26 Nov 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Restrictions

            1.    Dr. Merle Ang Vojdani may:

                  (i)   practise   as   a   general  practitioner  in  Oncology  and  as  a
                        hospitalist, only;
                  
                  (ii)  and also practise at  the  Winston  Park  Retirement  Home Assisted
                        Living;
                  
                  And
                  
                  (iii) perform assessments for the purpose of refraction for patients.