Vojvodich, Sandy Maria (CPSO#: 63590)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Mar 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Professional Building
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite 401
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 820-8952
Fax: (905) 820-8306
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 08 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDY MARIA VOJVODICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOJVODICH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1993