Volling, Cheryl Ann (CPSO#: 98510)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
U H N Toronto General Hospital
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHERYL ANN VOLLING shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. VOLLING is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. VOLLING shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. VOLLING is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. VOLLING shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. VOLLING is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. VOLLING no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 16 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 16 Nov 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 16 Nov 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 17 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 15 Nov 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 16 Nov 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018