Volpini, Brie Vaitonis (CPSO#: 84554)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Names: Mazza, Brie Vaitonis (used until: 18 Jun 2010 )     Mazza, Brie (used until: 20 Jun 2006 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6084
Fax: (416) 530-6107
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Volpini Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Volpini ( CPSO# 84554 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIE VAITONIS VOLPINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOLPINI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010