Volz, Bernhard Anton (CPSO#: 67089)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Beamsville Medical Centre
4279 Hixon Street
Box 430
Beamsville ON  L0R 1B0
Phone: (905) 563-5315
Fax: (905) 563-0933
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bernhard A. Volz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Volz ( CPSO# 67089 )

Business Address:
Beamsville Medical Centre
4279 Hixon Street
Box 430
Beamsville ON  L0R 1B0
Phone Number: (905) 563-5315

Business Address:
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P3
Phone Number: (905) 945-2253

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BERNHARD ANTON VOLZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOLZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1995