Von Ritschl, Rudiger Hugo Andreas (CPSO#: 66430)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
230 Cumberland Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4N3
Phone: 8073468646
Electoral District: 09

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUDIGER HUGO ANDREAS VON RITSCHL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VON RITSCHL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1999
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2005