Von Schroeder, Herbert Peter (CPSO#: 57175)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
University Hand Program
399 Bathurst Street
Room East 2-421
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5641
Fax: (416) 603-5813
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H.P. Von Schroeder Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Von Schroeder ( CPSO# 57175 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
2 East Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5641

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 13 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HERBERT PETER VON SCHROEDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VON SCHROEDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1992