Vonguyen, Lan (CPSO#: 72498)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 May 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 May 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 May 2007