Voogjarv, Harry Mikael (CPSO#: 59401)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Finnish, French

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Timmins and District Hospital
Suite 1583
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone: (705) 267-3566
Fax: (705) 267-3644
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Harry Voogjarv Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 09 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Voogjarv ( CPSO# 59401 )

Business Address:
1583 - 700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone Number: (705) 267-3566

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Anson General Hospital Iroquois Falls
Bingham Memorial Hospital Matheson

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 09 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARRY MIKAEL VOOGJARV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOOGJARV is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1989