Voon, Valerie (CPSO#: 71557)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Dec 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Addenbrookes Hospital
Cambridge CB20QQ
United Kingdom
Phone: 44 1223 761 32

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VALERIE VOON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2008