Voorhoeve, Paul David (CPSO#: 102910)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Voorhoeve Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Aug 2015