Vopicka, Avaleen Ann (CPSO#: 55584)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Fowler Kennedy Sport Medical Clinic
Fanshawe College
1460 Oxford Street East
PO Box 7005 Room SC1001
London ON  N5V 1W2
Phone: (519) 452-4230
Fax: (519) 452-4415
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Winquist Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Winquist ( CPSO# 57309 )
Dr. A. Vopicka ( CPSO# 55584 )

Business Address:
London Health Science Centre
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AVALEEN ANN VOPICKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOPICKA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1987