Voralia, Michael (CPSO#: 70627)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 12 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 23 Mar 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1997
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2002