Voros, Judit Gyulane (CPSO#: 65728)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of Szeged, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUDIT GYULANE VOROS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOROS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996