Voruganti, Lakshmi Narayana Pant (CPSO#: 64667)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Oct 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Oct 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Telugu

Education:Andhra Medical College, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar
Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 338-4663
Fax: (905) 338-4481
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

661 Martin street
Milton ON  L9T 3V9
Canada
Phone: 905-878-8141 Ext. 8406
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L.P. Voruganti Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Voruganti ( CPSO# 64667 )

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar
Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Business Address:
7030 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAKSHMI NARAYANA PANT VORUGANTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VORUGANTI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 1991