Voruganti, Sachi Mahita (CPSO#: 64713)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Telugu

Education:Andhra Medical College, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9495
Fax: (905) 575-6326
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Voruganti Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Voruganti ( CPSO# 64713 )

Business Address:
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 387-9495

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SACHI MAHITA VORUGANTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VORUGANTI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Jan 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1993