Vourlas, Anastasios (CPSO#: 55485)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Insight Diagnostic Imaging Corp
Suite 101
658 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 5B9
Phone: (416) 465-1726
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANASTASIOS VOURLAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOURLAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1986