Vowinckel, Erika Ann Meta (CPSO#: 76160)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Oct 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Oct 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Front Frederick Health
14th Floor
365 Bloor Street East
Toronto ON  M4W 3L4
Phone: (416) 362-8777
Fax: (416) 362-7879
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vowinckel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 26 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Vowinckel ( CPSO# 76160 )

Business Address:
Suite 1400
365 Bloor Street East
Toronto ON  M4W 3L4
Phone Number: (416) 362-8777

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Sep 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIKA ANN META VOWINCKEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOWINCKEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Mar 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2005