Voysey, Mark Allen (CPSO#: 52099)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Monash University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2E2
Phone: 416-925-7749
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

72 Orchard Blvd
Stevenson, Waplak & Associates
Belleville ON  K8P 2K7
Canada
Phone: (613) 9670545 Ext. 210
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Bayfield Homes
P O Box 10
Consecon ON  K0K 1T0
Canada
Phone: (613) 392-3551
County: County of Prince Edward
Electoral District: 06

2180 County Road 3
Carrying place
Belleville ON  K0K 1L3
Canada
Phone: (416) 925-7749
Fax: (613) 968-7503
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark A. Voysey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 10 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Voysey ( CPSO# 52099 )

Business Address:
Bayfield Homes
P.O. Box 10
Consecon ON  K0K 1T0
Phone Number: (613) 392-3551

Business Address:
2180 County Road 3
Carrying Place ON  K0K 1L0
Phone Number: (416) 931-4607

Business Address:
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2E2
Phone Number: (416) 925-7749

Business Address:
72 Orchard Boulevard
Belleville ON  K8P 2K7
Phone Number: (613) 967-0545

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 10 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK ALLEN VOYSEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOYSEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1987