Vozoris, Socrates Andrew (CPSO#: 75213)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:Thomas Jefferson University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
Cardiology Clinic
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 236-8749 Ext. 5
Fax: 855-720-1223
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Socrates A. Vozoris Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Vozoris ( CPSO# 75213 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 236-8749

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Oct 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOCRATES ANDREW VOZORIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOZORIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Mar 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Apr 2001 to 31 Oct 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2006