Vrabec, Gregory Alan (CPSO#: 59049)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Nov 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1992