Vrablik, Stefan (CPSO#: 23898)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Jul 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Slovak

Education:University of Palacky, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jul 2016

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 11, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the voluntary cease-to-practise Undertaking given by Dr. Stefan Vrablik to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 11, 2015:

Dr. Vrablik has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine due to retirement and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.