Vu, Bach Thuoc (CPSO#: 62613)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Dec 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Dec 2014