Vu, Erik Nelson (CPSO#: 80535)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 04 Apr 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Apr 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 08 Mar 2004 to 04 Apr 2004
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Apr 2004