Vu, Manh Huu (CPSO#: 52414)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:McMaster University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 31 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2017