Vu, Thi Nha Khanh (CPSO#: 73816)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 10 May 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 May 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Laval University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 11 Dec 2006 to 10 May 2007
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 May 2007