Vu, Thien-An John (CPSO#: 65946)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Aug 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Courtice Health Centre
1450 Highway 2
Courtice ON  L1E 3C3
Phone: (905) 723-8551 Ext. 4808
Fax: (905) 721-6186
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Vu ( CPSO# 65946 )

Business Address:
Courtice Heath Centre
1450 Highway No. 2
Courtice ON  L1E 3C3
Phone Number: (905) 723-8551

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THIEN-AN JOHN VU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1992