Vucemilo, Ivica (CPSO#: 78137)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English

Education:University of Zagreb, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 520
89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone: (905) 848-2121
Fax: (905) 919-3687
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ivica Vucemilo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Vucemilo ( CPSO# 78137 )

Business Address:
Suite 520
89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 848-7777

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 17 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IVICA VUCEMILO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VUCEMILO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007