Vujovic, Olga (CPSO#: 33736)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Sep 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Sep 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist
Radiation Oncology Effective: 28 May 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OLGA VUJOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VUJOVIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 1995 to 31 May 1996
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 1996 to 31 Jul 1997
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1982