Vukojevic, Duska (CPSO#: 80098)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English, Serbian

Education:Univerziteta "Djuro Pucar Stari" U Banja, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
205 Dundas St. E.
Suite 303
Belleville ON  K8N 1E2
Phone: (613) 969-7777
Fax: (613) 961-7773
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 07 Mar 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 02 Sep 2003 to 01 Mar 2004
International Specialist Physician - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 02 Mar 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 28 Aug 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 28 Aug 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Jan 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Jan 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jul 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2018 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Duska  Vukojevic  may  practise  medicine  independently in obstetrics and
            gynaecology.