Vuong, Te (CPSO#: 56035)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Montreal, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 04 Sep 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Radiation Oncology Effective: 24 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987