Vupputuri, Sujana Kumari (CPSO#: 59330)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medcan Clinic
150 York Street, Suite 1500
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone: (416) 350-5900
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mukherjee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mukherjee ( CPSO# 58002 )
Dr. S. Vupputuri ( CPSO# 59330 )

Business Address:
410 - 325 Milner Avevnue
Scarborough ON  M1B 5N1

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUJANA KUMARI VUPPUTURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VUPPUTURI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1989