Vyas, Manav Viratbhai (CPSO#: 98570)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:Gujarat University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences
2075 Bayview Avenue
Division of Neurology
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-6100
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANAV VIRATBHAI VYAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VYAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Neurology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017