Wachsmuth, John Jeffrey (CPSO#: 100745)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Feb 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roman and Wachsmuth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Roman ( CPSO# 101184)
Dr. J. Wachsmuth ( CPSO# 100745)

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6

Business Address:
302 - 170 Simcoe Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 2H7

Business Address:
111 - 1600 West Bank Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7B8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN JEFFREY WACHSMUTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WACHSMUTH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2016