Wada, Ryan (CPSO#: 83344)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
132 - 6707 Elbow Drive SW
Calgary AB  T2V 0E3
Phone: (403) 777-3003

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
Northwest Territories
Nunavut
Saskatchewan
Yukon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RYAN WADA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WADA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005