Waddell, Charlotte Allison (CPSO#: 63663)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jun 2001