Waddell, James Patterson (CPSO#: 21620)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Aug 1968

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 1968

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6001
Fax: (416) 864-6010
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James P. Waddell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Waddell ( CPSO# 21620 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6001


Corporation Name: Dr. Amit Atrey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Waddell ( CPSO# 21620 )
Dr. A. Atrey ( CPSO# 97167 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Division of Orthopedic Surgery
800 - 55 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 1R6
Phone Number: (416) 864-5392

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 02 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES PATTERSON WADDELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WADDELL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1968