Waddell, Thomas Kenneth (CPSO#: 58357)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Dec 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Norman Urquhart 9-949
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3432
Fax: (416) 340-4556
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Thomas K. Waddell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Waddell ( CPSO# 58357 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Suite 9N-949
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3432

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 17 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS KENNETH WADDELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WADDELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 6 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Resident 7 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 1990