Wade, Caitlin Jayne (CPSO#: 95882)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
31 Canadian Forces Health Services
Centre Building D-166
30 Ortona Road
PO Box 1000 Station Main
Borden ON  L0M1C0
Phone: 705-424-1200 Ext. 2377
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAITLIN JAYNE WADE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WADE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 09 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 10 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015