Wadhwa, Anupma (CPSO#: 74881)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6273
Fax: (416) 813-5032
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 12 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANUPMA WADHWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WADHWA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2002